EP0312454 - Method of waste elimination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1990 | Change - withdrawal | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D.S. ENVIRONNEMENT La Roue F-69380 Lissieu / FR | [1989/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blanchard, Jean-Marie 6, allée des Rossignols F-69160 Tassin la Demi Lune / FR | 02 /
Didier, Gérard 52, Grande Rue des Charpennes F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Timoney, Ian Charles Craig ELF AQUITAINE Departement Propriété Industrielle Tour Elf Cedex 45 92078 Paris la Défense / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Timoney, Ian Charles Craig ELF AQUITAINE Departement Propriété Industrielle Tour Elf Cedex 45 F-92078 Paris La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402586.7 | 12.10.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | FR19870014091 | 13.10.1987 Original published format: FR 8714091 | [1989/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0312454 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0312454 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, G01N13/00, G01N15/08 | [1989/16] | CPC: |
B09B3/00 (EP);
B09B3/25 (EP,US);
B09B3/32 (US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beseitigung von Rückständen | [1989/16] | English: | Method of waste elimination | [1989/16] | French: | Procédé d'élimination de déchets | [1989/16] | File destroyed: | 02.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 17.10.1988 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 08.12.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS58156399 [ ]; | GB1361042 [ ] (CORSON G & W H); | DE2456225 [ ] (I U CONVERSION SYSTEMS INC); | DE3021945 [ ] (HOELTER HEINZ ING GRAD [DE]); | EP0050371 [ ] (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]); | FR2515076 [ ] (SIMOND JACQUES [FR]); | FR2545387 [ ] (PICHAT PHILIPPE [FR]); | DE3333438 [ ] (CHEMITEC GMBH [DE]); | DE3520149 [ ] (PEINE JOHANNES) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 97, No. 6, aout 1982, page 296, Ref. No. 43739t, Columbus, Ohio, US; J. TAUCHNITZ et al.: "Deposition of industrial waste products - fixation of cyanide ions with brown coal ashes from electrostatic filtration", & Acta Hydrochim. Hydrobiol. 1982, 10(3), 299-303Abrege. | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 7, No. 277 (C-199)(1422), 9 Decembre 1983; & JP,A,58 156 399 (TERUO OOTA) 17-09-1983Abrege. |