EP0305318 - Method for the manufacture of ink channels in a print head of an ink jet matrix printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dreinhoff, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Alsterweg 55b D-1000 Berlin 37 / DE | [1989/09] | Application number, filing date | 88730181.0 | 12.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | DE19873729206 | 28.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3729206 | [1989/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0305318 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/04, B05D7/22 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
B41J2/1637 (EP,US);
B05D7/22 (EP,US);
B41J2/1615 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ausbilden von Tintenkanälen in einem Schreibkopf für eine Tintenmosaikschreibeinrichtung | [1989/09] | English: | Method for the manufacture of ink channels in a print head of an ink jet matrix printer | [1989/09] | French: | Procédé de fabrication des canaux d'encre dans une tête d'impression pour une imprimante matricielle à jet d'encre | [1989/09] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 27.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 28.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/36] | 09.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5571572 ; | [Y]EP0145880 (NIXDORF COMPUTER AG [DE]); | [A]US4248823 (BADER LEONHARD, et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 4, Nr. 114 (M-26)[596], 15. August 1980, Seite 45M26; & JP-A-55 71 572 (RICOH K.K.) 29-05-1980, & JP5571572 A 00000000 |