blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0306461

EP0306461 - Tool having a built-in light source [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.03.1990
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.1990Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.1990 [1990/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tuvesson, Jan Lennart
Box 139
S-243 00 Höör / SE
[1989/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Tuvesson, Jan Lennart
Box 139
S-243 00 Höör / SE
02 / Ljungberg, Per
St. Tvärgatan 9
S 223 53 Lund / SE
[1989/10]
Representative(s)Holmqvist, Lars
Albihns Patentbyra Malmö AB P.O.Box 4289
203 14 Malmö 4 / SE
[N/P]
Former [1989/10]Holmqvist, Lars J.H.
Albihn Holmqvist AB, Box 4289
S-203 14 Malmö 4 / SE
Application number, filing date88850066.724.02.1988
[1989/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0306461
Date:08.03.1989
Language:EN
[1989/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.1988
ClassificationIPC:B26B11/00, B25B23/18
[1989/10]
CPC:
B26B11/008 (EP); B25B23/18 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/10]
TitleGerman:Werkzeug mit eingebauter Lichtquelle[1989/10]
English:Tool having a built-in light source[1989/10]
French:Outil à source lumineuse incorporée[1989/10]
File destroyed:27.01.1999
Examination procedure09.09.1989Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/18]
05.12.1989Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1990/18]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3185832  ;
 [A]FR807012  ;
 [X]US1868778  ;
 [Y]FR2139304  ;
 [A]US1890841
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.