EP0344177 - POROUS WAFER FOR SEGMENTED SYNTHESIS OF BIOPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030 / US | [1989/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEATTIE, Kenneth, L. 11018 Bob White Houston, TX 77096 / US | 02 /
FROST, James, D., III 3805 Villanova Houston, TX 77005 / US | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88900994.0 | 30.12.1987 | [1989/49] | WO1987US03462 | Priority number, date | US19870000716 | 06.01.1987 Original published format: US 716 | [1989/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8805074 | Date: | 14.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0344177 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344177 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.07.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, B01J8/02 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP);
B01J19/0046 (EP);
B01J2219/00286 (EP);
B01J2219/00322 (EP);
B01J2219/00391 (EP);
B01J2219/00423 (EP);
B01J2219/00454 (EP);
B01J2219/00461 (EP);
B01J2219/005 (EP);
B01J2219/00502 (EP);
B01J2219/00585 (EP);
B01J2219/0059 (EP);
B01J2219/00592 (EP);
B01J2219/00596 (EP);
B01J2219/00689 (EP);
B01J2219/00722 (EP);
C40B40/06 (EP);
C40B50/14 (EP);
C40B60/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1994/19] |
Former [1989/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | PORÖSER WAFER ZUR SEGMENTIERTEN HERSTELLUNG VON BIPOLYMEREN | [1989/49] | English: | POROUS WAFER FOR SEGMENTED SYNTHESIS OF BIOPOLYMERS | [1989/49] | French: | PLAQUETTE GAUFREE POREUSE POUR LA SYNTHESE SEGMENTEE DE BIOPOLYMERES | [1989/49] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.1988 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.1988 | Search fee paid | 13.10.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 26.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/49] | 28.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3647390 (KUBODERA TOSHIYA, et al); | [X]US3763879 (JAWOREK D); | [X]US4155846 (BOWDLE PAUL H [US], et al); | [X]US4301139 (FEINGERS JUDITH, et al); | [X]EP0164206 (HAMILL BRENDAN JAMES); | [XP]US4678769 (KING BONNIE J [US]) | Examination | US3401139 |