EP0371015 - VACUUM MODULATOR TRACTION CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | ||
Former [1990/23] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUDOLPH, Robert, S. 10331 Hickory Hills Court Osceola, IN 46561 / US | 02 /
CAGE, Jerry, L. 50700 Canyon Lane Granger, IN 46530 / US | 03 /
HOFFMAN, Thomas, J. 50664 Sorrel Drive Granger, IN 46530 / US | 04 /
GATT, Michael, E. 11455 Windemere Court Osceola, IN 46561 / US | [1990/23] | Representative(s) | Lejet, Christian, et al BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | Lejet, Christian, et al BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 88901401.5 | 22.12.1987 | [1990/23] | WO1987US03457 | Priority number, date | US19870083491 | 10.08.1987 Original published format: US 83491 | [1990/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8901433 | Date: | 23.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0371015 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0371015 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/48 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
B60T8/4854 (EP,US);
B60T8/48 (KR);
B60T13/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/23] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSCHLUPFREGELUNG MIT VAKUUMMODULATOR | [1990/23] | English: | VACUUM MODULATOR TRACTION CONTROL | [1990/23] | French: | REGULATION DE TRACTION PAR MODULATEUR DE VIDE | [1990/23] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.1990 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 18.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB2178499 [ ] (TEVES GMBH ALFRED); | GB1160354 [ ] (BENDIX CORP [US]); | US4575161 [ ] (VANZANT TEDDY L [US], et al); | WO8604309 [ ] (FAIL SAFE BRAKE CORP [US]); | GB2161562 [ ] (TEVES GMBH ALFRED) | Examination | - Patent Abstracts of Japan, vol. 9, no. 282 (M-428)(2005), 9 November 1985 |