|
18.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.1996 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1996 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.1996 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
24.05.1996 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.1996 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.1996 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.1995 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.1994 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.1994 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.1994 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.09.1994 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.1994 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1994 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1994 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1994 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1994 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.07.1994 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.1994 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1994 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1993 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1993 |
Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.1993 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.09.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1992 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.1992 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1992 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
31.03.1992 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.1989 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1989 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1989 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1989 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.1989 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.1989 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.1989 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.1989 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.1989 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.1989 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.06.1989 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.1989 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.1988 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.10.1988 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.1988 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.1988 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
25.04.1988 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.1988 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
27.03.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |