EP0328600 - CORRUGATED PIPE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/34] | CORRUGATED PIPE CONNECTOR AND METHOD OF MOLDING | ||
[1992/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.1994 [1994/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELCONNEX PTY. LIMITED 139 Lower Washington Drive Bonnet Bay, NSW 2226 / AU | [1989/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETTY, John 139 Lower Washington Drive Bonnet Bay, NSW 2226 / AU | 02 /
MCNEILL, Sandy 33 Alexandra Street Hunters Hill, NSW 2110 / AU | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | Fitzpatrick, Alan James, et al Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | Fitzpatrick, Alan James, et al Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1989/34] | Fitzpatrick, Alan James Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 88907184.1 | 04.08.1988 | [1989/34] | WO1988AU00292 | Priority number, date | AU19870003598 | 04.08.1987 Original published format: AU 359887 | [1989/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8901109 | Date: | 09.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0328600 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0328600 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 09.02.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/16, B29C39/36 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
F16L25/0045 (EP,US);
F16L37/16 (KR);
B29C33/0033 (EP,US);
B29C33/485 (EP,US);
B29C37/0014 (EP,US);
B29C45/4407 (EP,US);
B29C45/4421 (EP,US);
F16L37/0985 (EP,US);
F16L37/22 (EP,US);
G02B6/4435 (EP,US);
G02B6/4459 (EP,US);
B29L2031/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, LI [1989/34] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG FÜR GEWELLTE ROHRE | [1992/29] | English: | CORRUGATED PIPE CONNECTOR | [1992/29] | French: | RACCORD POUR TUYAUX CANNELES | [1992/29] |
Former [1989/34] | VERBINDUNG FÜR GEWELLTE ROHRE UND GIESSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [1989/34] | CORRUGATED PIPE CONNECTOR AND METHOD OF MOLDING | ||
Former [1989/34] | RACCORD POUR TUYAUX CANNELES ET PROCEDE DE MOULAGE | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.1989 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.1989 | Search fee paid | 28.04.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/41] | 19.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP59142110 [ ]; | EP0073334 [ ] (HC IND [US]); | US4575133 [ ] (NATTEL WILLIAM [CA]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 8, No. 270, Dec. 11, 1984 (M-344)(1707); & JP,A,59 142 110 (TOYODA GOSEI) 15 August 1984, figures 1,2., & JP59142110 A 19840815 | International search | [A]AU3154767B ; | [A]AU3301563B ; | [A]AU135440B ; | [A]GB2073650 (SIMON HANS); | [X]EP0046616 (WAVIN BV [NL]); | [A]US4351791 (DE PUTTER WARNER J); | [A]DE3405583 (DAIICHI GEYER KK [JP]); | [A]EP0125097 (SUN COAST PLASTICS INC [US]); | [A]US4542922 (GROSSAUER ALFRED [CH]); | [XP]WO8704767 (ELCONNEX PTY LTD [AU]) | Examination | - Kunststoff-Lexikon, 1981, p. 187 |