|
09.02.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.1995 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.08.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.05.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
09.11.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.09.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1992 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1992 |
Letter Legal Board, with references of sender |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1992 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Letter Legal Board, with references of sender |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.02.1992 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Appeal |
36 |
|
17.01.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1991 |
F3203 Composition of the Board (J) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1991 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.1991 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.03.1991 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.1991 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.1991 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.1991 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.11.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1990 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.02.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.12.1989 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1989 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1989 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.1989 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.06.1989 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
20.06.1989 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.1989 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1989 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.05.1989 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
11.05.1989 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.1989 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.09.1988 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.1988 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.1988 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |