|
20.05.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2004 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
20 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
19.03.2003 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2003 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2003 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2003 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.01.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.04.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.04.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.02.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
31 |
|
05.12.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.12.2000 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.12.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
56 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.11.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.11.2000 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2000 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.08.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.08.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
33 |
|
03.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.07.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.04.2000 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.04.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.03.2000 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.03.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.10.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.10.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.1998 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.09.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.08.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.02.1996 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.01.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.1995 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
101 |
|
27.03.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.1995 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.03.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.1995 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1995 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
10.03.1995 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.1995 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1994 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.12.1990 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1990 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.1990 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1990 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1990 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
16.11.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.11.1989 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.1989 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.1989 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.1989 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.1989 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1989 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1989 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.05.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.1989 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.1989 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1989 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
99 |
|
23.03.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
24.10.1988 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |