|
26.06.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2001 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2001 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.02.2001 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2001 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.04.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.01.1997 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.1996 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.1996 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
02.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1996 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.01.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.1995 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1994 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
27.09.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
18 |
|
20.09.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.11.1993 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.1993 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.1993 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
26.01.1993 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.06.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.04.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.1990 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.1990 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.06.1989 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.1989 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.04.1989 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.04.1989 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
20.04.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |