EP0328860 - Metallic contact piece for a measuring lance for measuring operations in molten metals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Electro-Nite International N.V. Amerikalei 110, bus 5 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states Heraeus Electro-Nite International N.V. Amerikalei 110, bus 5 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [1989/34] | For all designated states ELECTRO-NITE INTERNATIONAL N.V. Amerikalei 110 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knevels, Johan Maria Joseph Opitterpoort 20 B-3690 Bree / BE | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | Heinen, Gerhard W.C. Heraeus GmbH Zentralbereich Patente und Lizenzen Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | Heinen, Gerhard, Dr. W.C. Heraeus GmbH Zentralbereich Patente und Lizenzen Heraeusstrasse 12-14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 89100145.5 | 05.01.1989 | [1989/34] | Priority number, date | DE19883804880 | 17.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3804880 | [1989/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0328860 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0328860 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0328860 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/20, G01K7/02 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
G01K7/023 (EP,US);
G01N33/2025 (EP,US);
Y10S277/91 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/34] | G01N33/20 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/34] | Title | German: | Metallisches Kontaktstück für eine Messlanze zur Durchführung von Messungen in Metallschmelzen | [1989/34] | English: | Metallic contact piece for a measuring lance for measuring operations in molten metals | [1989/34] | French: | Pièce métallique de contact pour une lance de mesure pour faire des mesures dans les métaux en fusion | [1989/34] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.02.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4582951 (SHUTTLEWORTH WILLIAM E [US]); | [A]US4645243 (BUCHER CLAUDE [FR], et al) | [AP] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, Nr. 288, April 1988, Seite 243, New York, US; R.W. EDWARDS: "Low coolant sensing probe with connector corrosion prevention" |