EP0331915 - Cosmetic use of polysiloxanes with a beta-ketoester function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grollier, Jean-Francois 16 bis Boulevard Morland F-75004 Paris / FR | 02 /
Dubief, Claude 9, Rue Edmond Rostand F-78150 Le Chesnay / FR | [1989/37] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/37] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-8000 Munich 5 / DE | Application number, filing date | 89102113.1 | 08.02.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | LU19880087127 | 08.02.1988 Original published format: LU 87127 | [1989/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0331915 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0331915 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/48, A61K7/00 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
A61K8/893 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
Y10S424/01 (EP,US);
Y10S424/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/20] |
Former [1989/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Kosmetische Verwendung von Polysiloxanen mit beta-Ketoester-Funktion | [1989/37] | English: | Cosmetic use of polysiloxanes with a beta-ketoester function | [1989/37] | French: | Application cosmétique de polysiloxanes à fonction beta-cétoester | [1989/37] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.1993 | DE | 28.07.1993 | GB | 28.07.1993 | GR | 28.07.1993 | IT | 28.07.1993 | NL | 28.07.1993 | SE | 28.07.1993 | BE | 28.02.1994 | CH | 28.02.1994 | LI | 28.02.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 28.07.1993 | |
DE | 28.07.1993 | ||
GB | 28.07.1993 | ||
IT | 28.07.1993 | ||
NL | 28.07.1993 | ||
SE | 28.07.1993 | ||
BE | 28.02.1994 | ||
CH | 28.02.1994 | ||
LI | 28.02.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | AT | 28.07.1993 | |
DE | 28.07.1993 | ||
GB | 28.07.1993 | ||
NL | 28.07.1993 | ||
SE | 28.07.1993 | ||
BE | 28.02.1994 | ||
CH | 28.02.1994 | ||
LI | 28.02.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 28.07.1993 | |
DE | 28.07.1993 | ||
GB | 28.07.1993 | ||
NL | 28.07.1993 | ||
SE | 28.07.1993 | ||
CH | 28.02.1994 | ||
LI | 28.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/41] | AT | 28.07.1993 | |
DE | 28.07.1993 | ||
GB | 28.07.1993 | ||
NL | 28.07.1993 | ||
SE | 28.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | AT | 28.07.1993 | |
DE | 28.07.1993 | ||
SE | 28.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/19] | AT | 28.07.1993 | |
SE | 28.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/16] | SE | 28.07.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0186438 (DOW CORNING [US]); | [A]EP0251679 (DOW CORNING [US]); | [AP]FR2602776 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR], et al) |