EP0330953 - Powder-actuated fastening tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft FL-9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfister, Norbert St. Galler Strasse 31 CH-9470 Buchs / CH | 02 /
Philipp, Leo Quadrella CH-7204 Untervaz / CH | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | [2009/38] |
Former [1989/36] | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung FL-9490 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 89102883.9 | 20.02.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | DE19883806625 | 02.03.1988 Original published format: DE 3806625 | [1989/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0330953 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0330953 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0330953 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B25C1/18 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
B25C1/184 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1989/36] | Title | German: | Pulverkraftbetriebenes Setzgerät | [1989/36] | English: | Powder-actuated fastening tool | [1989/36] | French: | Outil d'enfoncement actionnée à poudre | [1989/36] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 09.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2150332 (MAYNARD ARTHUR H); | [A]US3910324 (NASIATKA JOHN R); | [A]US4136810 (BULL WILLIAM T); | [A]EP0237477 (HILTI AG [LI]) |