|
20.07.1999 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1999 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1999 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
30 |
|
07.04.1999 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.02.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.12.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.1998 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.1998 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.1997 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.11.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1997 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.1997 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.08.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.1996 |
Annex |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
53 |
|
31.01.1996 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.1996 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.1996 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.1996 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.1996 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.10.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.1995 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1995 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.10.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.1995 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1995 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.10.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.03.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1995 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.1995 |
N/A |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
19.12.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
33 |
|
27.10.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.1994 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.1994 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.1994 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1994 |
N/A |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.1994 |
N/A |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.1994 |
N/A |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.04.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
18.04.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.04.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.04.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.04.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.03.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.03.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.03.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.05.1993 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.11.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.1992 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1992 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
25.07.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
25.07.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1992 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.1992 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1991 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1991 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
05.09.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
05.09.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.1990 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.1990 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1990 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1990 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.1989 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.1989 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1989 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1989 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.1989 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.1989 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.1989 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.03.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
10.03.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1989 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |