EP0386298 - Uv-stabilized coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1990/37] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moore, James Eugene 901 Lower New Harmony Road Mt. Vernon Indiana 47620 / US | 02 /
Factor, Arnold (NMN) 28 County Fair Lane Scotia New York 12302 / US | 03 /
Miranda, Peter Martin 22 Woodruf Drive Scotia New York 12302 / US | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18, rue Horace Vernet 92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89104234.3 | 10.03.1989 | [1990/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0386298 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09D133/04, C08K5/3475, C08J7/04 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
C08K5/3475 (EP,US);
C08F20/18 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C09D4/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F220/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/37] | Title | German: | UV-stabilisierte Beschichtungen | [1990/37] | English: | Uv-stabilized coatings | [1990/37] | French: | Revêtements stabilisés aux ultraviolets | [1990/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 15.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/09] | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0057160 ; | [A]US4556606 (OLSON DANIEL R [US]); | [Y]EP0274595 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |