|
12.08.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.08.1998 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1998 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.1998 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.1998 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.1998 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.1998 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
32 |
|
10.07.1998 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
27.06.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
26.06.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
26.06.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.06.1998 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.1998 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.1998 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.1998 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.1998 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1998 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1998 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
02.06.1998 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1998 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.1998 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.08.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.01.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.01.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.12.1996 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.12.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.12.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
18.06.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.06.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.06.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.06.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.05.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.05.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.1996 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.1996 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
23.02.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
24 |
|
17.01.1996 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1996 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
08.12.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
22.08.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1995 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.07.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.06.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.01.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.05.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.04.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.04.1994 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.02.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.01.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.11.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1993 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
29.09.1993 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1993 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.1993 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1993 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.05.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.1993 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.1993 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.1993 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.02.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1992 |
Deletion of the entry relating to the representative ('et al' case) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.1992 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.1992 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.1992 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1992 |
Communication of notices of intervention |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1992 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1992 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1992 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1992 |
Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.1992 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.06.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.06.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.06.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.06.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.06.1992 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.1992 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.1992 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.06.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.06.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
01.06.1992 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.06.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.09.1991 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1991 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1991 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.1991 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.1991 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1990 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
04.10.1990 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.04.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
09.04.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.04.1990 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
09.04.1990 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.1990 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.1990 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.01.1990 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.1989 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.07.1989 |
The request for correction will be decided by the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1989 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
25.03.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
25.03.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
15.03.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
14.03.1989 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1989 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
14.03.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
14.03.1989 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
14.03.1989 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |