EP0333192 - Device for emptying receptacles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.1992 [1992/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hagemann & Partner Gesellschaft für Umwelttechnik mbH Saalmannstrasse 7-9 D-1000 Berlin 51 / DE | [1990/29] |
Former [1989/38] | For all designated states HANS HAGEMANN UMWELTTECHNIK Saalmannstrasse 7/9 D-1000 Berlin 51 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagemann, Hans Hermann Karl Albert Am Kesselpfuhl 9 D-1000 Berlin 26 / DE | 02 /
Fernahl-Gaisser geb. Fernahl, Gudrun Gisela Rheingaustrasse 3 D-1000 Berlin 41 / DE | 03 /
Späth, Ernst Karl Zweiwinkelweg 11 D-1000 Berlin 20 / DE | [1989/38] | Representative(s) | Vomberg, Friedhelm RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Kaiserswerther Straße 215 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | Vomberg, Friedhelm, Dipl.-Phys. Schulstrasse 8 D-42653 Solingen / DE | ||
Former [1989/38] | Vomberg, Friedhelm, Dipl.-Phys. Schulstrasse 8 D-42653 Solingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89104733.4 | 16.03.1989 | [1989/38] | Priority number, date | DE19883809134 | 18.03.1988 Original published format: DE 3809134 | [1989/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0333192 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0333192 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65F3/04 | [1989/38] | CPC: |
B65F3/041 (EP);
B65F2003/024 (EP);
B65F2003/0286 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1989/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entleeren von Behältern | [1989/38] | English: | Device for emptying receptacles | [1989/38] | French: | Dispositif pour la vidange de récipients | [1989/38] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 04.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/53] | 04.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2553548 (PFITZENMEIER & RAU); | [A]FR2528810 (FARID SPA [IT]); | [A]US4479751 (WYMAN JAMES H [US], et al); | [A]NL8501396 (GEESINK BV) |