EP0334367 - Photographic light-sensitive material having a polyester film support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1996 [1996/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED 4845, Mishima-shi Shizuoka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | ||
For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED 4845, Mishima-shi Shizuoka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satake, Seimi 210, Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Shibahara, Yoshihiko 210, Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Ueda, Toshiaki 4845, Mishima-shi Shizuoka / JP | 04 /
Kida, Kenji 4845, Mishima-shi Shizuoka / JP | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 D-81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89105268.0 | 23.03.1989 | [1989/39] | Priority number, date | JP19880071308 | 25.03.1988 Original published format: JP 7130888 | [1989/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0334367 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0334367 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0334367 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/76 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
G03C1/7954 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/39] | Title | German: | Photographisches lichtempfindliches Material mit Polyesterträger | [1989/39] | English: | Photographic light-sensitive material having a polyester film support | [1989/39] | French: | Matériau photographique photosensible avec support en polyester | [1989/39] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 11.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3052543 ; | [YD]US4217441 ; | [Y]US4183749 |