EP0340462 - Rotating-drum furnace for drying or mixing freely flowing materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutag Asphalttechnik GmbH Siegburger Strasse 229 D-50679 Köln / DE | [1993/02] |
Former [1989/45] | For all designated states Deutag-Mischwerke GmbH Siegburger Strasse 229 D-5000 Köln 21 (Deutz) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linxen, Ingolf, Ing. (grad.) Hofreitenstrasse 38 D-7560 Gaggenau-Selbach / DE | [1989/45] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 89105913.1 | 05.04.1989 | [1989/45] | Priority number, date | DE19883815104 | 04.05.1988 Original published format: DE 3815104 | [1989/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0340462 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0340462 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F27B7/16, F26B11/14 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
F27B7/161 (EP);
F26B11/0477 (EP);
F27B7/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1989/45] | Title | German: | Drehofen zum Trocknen und/oder Mischen von rieselfähigem Material | [1989/45] | English: | Rotating-drum furnace for drying or mixing freely flowing materials | [1989/45] | French: | Four à tambour rotatif pour sécher ou mélanger des matériaux susceptibles de couler ou de ruisseler | [1989/45] | Examination procedure | 28.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 08.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1116508 (CIE DE FIVES LILLE); | [A]BE858730 (OBOURG SA CIMENTS); | [X]US4189300 (BUTLER THEODORE G [US]); | [X]FR2441682 (CREUSOT LOIRE); | [A]EP0030403 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE], et al); | [X]EP0032468 (CREUSOT LOIRE [FR]) |