|
20.11.2003 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2003 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2003 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Annex |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.06.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2003 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.03.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2002 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2002 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.07.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.06.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.09.2000 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2000 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2000 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
15.03.2000 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
10.02.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.1999 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1999 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1999 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
16.12.1999 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.01.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.1996 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
08.07.1996 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1996 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.1996 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1996 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1996 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1996 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.05.1996 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1996 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.1996 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.10.1995 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1995 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1995 |
Annex |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.01.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.1993 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.1991 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.1989 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1989 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.1989 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.1989 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1989 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1989 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.04.1989 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.04.1989 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1989 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |