EP0348851 - A high specific thrust linear motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 04.12.1991 [1991/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHASE S.R.L. Via F.lli Canale 50r 16132 Genova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states PHASE S.R.L. Via F.lli Canale 50r I-16132 Genova / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Venturini, Marco Via S. Scorza, 15/21a Genova / IT | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Monti, Umberto Via Washington 48 20146 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Monti, Umberto Via Washington 48 I-20146 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89111515.6 | 24.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | IT19880021186 | 01.07.1988 Original published format: IT 2118688 | [1990/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0348851 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02K41/03 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
H02K41/033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/01] | Title | German: | Linearmotor mit hoher spezifischer Schubkraft | [1990/01] | English: | A high specific thrust linear motor | [1990/01] | French: | Moteur linéaire à force de poussée longitudinale élevée | [1990/01] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 07.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/48] | 27.09.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/49] | 02.10.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.08.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   07.09.1990 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU978284 ; | [AP]JP63089049 ; | [A]FR2189908 (CEM COMP ELECTRO MEC [FR]); | [A]US4075539 (WADA TASAKU); | [A]DE3208380 (MOCZALA HELMUT PROF DR ING); | [A]GB2194689 (STEMME OTTO) | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED section Electrical, Week K39, abstract no. 776141, X11, 9 November 1983, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & SU-A1-978284 (ODESS SPEC TOOLS) 30.11.1982, & SU978284 A1 00000000 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 324 (E-653)(3171), 2 September 1988; & JP-A-63 089049 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 20.04.1988, & JP63089049 A 19880902 |