EP0351654 - High accuracy coordinate conversion method for air traffic control applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wasser, Barry 12405 Bobbink Court Potomac, MD 20854 / US | 02 /
Morin, Wilfried William 7231 Landis Avenue Sea Isle City New York 08243 / US | [1990/04] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang, et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/52] | Harrison, Robert John IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/19] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/13] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | ||
Former [1990/04] | Blutke, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland GmbH Intellectual Property Dept. Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112326.7 | 06.07.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | US19880222588 | 21.07.1988 Original published format: US 222588 | [1990/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351654 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351654 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0351654 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/295, G01S13/91 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
G01S13/91 (EP,US);
G01S7/2955 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur hochgenauen Koordinaten-Transformierung für Luftverkehrsüberwachungs-Anwendungen | [1990/04] | English: | High accuracy coordinate conversion method for air traffic control applications | [1990/04] | French: | Procédé de transformation de coordonnées à haute précision pour des applications de contrôle du trafic aérien | [1990/04] | Examination procedure | 12.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/28] | 30.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 28.12.1994 | NL | 28.12.1994 | [1999/42] |
Former [1995/49] | NL | 28.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3996590 (HAMMACK CALVIN MILES); | [A]US4196474 (BUCHANAN WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [A]EP0199380 (BOEING CO [US]); | [AP]US4791572 (GREEN III LAWRENCE R [US], et al) | [AD] - MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY LINCOLN LABORATORY, Technical report no. 67, 13th September 1954, Lexington, MA, US; D. GOLDENBERG et al.: "A common co-ordinate system for the utilization of data from several radars" | [A] - A.S. LOCKE et al.: "Guidance", 1955, D. Van Nostrand Co., Inc., Princeton, US |