EP0352612 - Process for the production of a printing plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1990/05] | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kossmehl, Gerhard, Prof. Grabenstrasse 38F D-1000 Berlin 45 / DE | 02 /
Niemitz, Matthias Tapiauer Allee 5 D-1000 Berlin 19 / DE | 03 /
Kabbeck-Kupijai, Detlef Setheweg 12 D-1000 Berlin 22 / DE | [1990/05] | Application number, filing date | 89113215.1 | 19.07.1989 | [1990/05] | Priority number, date | DE19883825850 | 29.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3825850 | [1990/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0352612 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0352612 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10 | [1990/05] | CPC: |
B41C1/1033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1990/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Druckform | [1990/05] | English: | Process for the production of a printing plate | [1990/05] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une plaque d'impression | [1990/05] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/14] | 15.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0160920 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [Y]US3106155 (EASTMAN DONALD R, et al); | [Y]EP0200488 (IBM [US]); | [A]US4068588 (NAKANO KEITA, et al); | [AD]EP0101266 (MILLIKEN RES CORP [US]); | [AD]FR2392828 (HELL RUDOLF [DE]); | [XPD]EP0279066 (MAN TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]); | [XP]EP0317779 (MAN TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 20, Nr. 10, März 1978, pages 4176-4177, New York, US; A. AVIRAM et al.: "Anodic electrolytic induction of wettability" |