EP0383994 - Air rectification process and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rottmann, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. O.-M.-Graf-Ring 33 D-8000 München 83 / DE | [1990/35] | Representative(s) | Schaefer, Gerhard Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | Schaefer, Gerhard, Dr. Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113815.8 | 26.07.1989 | [1990/35] | Priority number, date | DE19893905521 | 23.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3905521 | [1990/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0383994 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0383994 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/04 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
F25J3/0486 (EP,US);
F25J3/0409 (EP,US);
F25J3/04206 (EP,US);
F25J3/0423 (US);
F25J3/04315 (EP,US);
F25J3/04327 (US);
F25J3/04351 (EP,US);
F25J3/04412 (EP,US);
F25J3/04678 (US);
F25J3/04709 (US);
F25J2200/20 (EP,US);
F25J2230/42 (EP);
F25J2230/52 (US);
F25J2235/58 (US);
F25J2245/02 (US);
F25J2245/42 (EP,US);
F25J2250/40 (EP,US);
F25J2250/50 (EP,US);
Y10S62/924 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Luftzerlegung durch Rektifikation | [1990/35] | English: | Air rectification process and apparatus | [1990/35] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de rectification d'air | [1990/35] | File destroyed: | 12.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/03] | 19.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2666303 (MAURICE SCHUFTAN PAUL); | [A]DE2548222 (LINDE AG); | [A]EP0316768 (LINDE AG [DE]) |