EP0356912 - A method for the preparation of an optically active 2-substituted carboxylic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.06.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Nobuo c/o Idemitsu Kosan Company Limited 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | [1990/10] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 89115610.1 | 24.08.1989 | [1990/10] | Priority number, date | JP19880212536 | 29.08.1988 Original published format: JP 21253688 | JP19880318587 | 19.12.1988 Original published format: JP 31858788 | JP19890134743 | 30.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13474389 | [1990/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356912 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356912 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/40, C12P41/00 | [1990/10] | CPC: |
C12P41/006 (EP);
C12P7/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2-substituierter, optisch aktiver Karbonsäure | [1990/10] | English: | A method for the preparation of an optically active 2-substituted carboxylic acid | [1990/10] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une acide carbonique 2-substitué optiquement actif | [1990/10] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 09.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/32] | 23.03.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8607386 ; | [A]EP0193113 ; | [XP]EP0326482 ; | [E]EP0330529 ; | [E]EP0348901 |