EP0364847 - Motor bogie for a railway vehicle with a low floor over its whole length [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM SA 38, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM SA 38, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodet, Alain Résidence du Parc de la Couronne Bât. A, route de Montcenis F-71200 Le Creusot / FR | [1990/17] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118703.1 | 09.10.1989 | [1990/17] | Priority number, date | FR19880013704 | 18.10.1988 Original published format: FR 8813704 | [1990/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0364847 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0364847 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B61F3/04, B61F5/52, B61C9/52, B61D13/00 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
B61F3/04 (EP);
B61C9/52 (EP);
B61D13/00 (EP);
B61F5/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/17] | Title | German: | Motordrehgestell für Schienenfahrzeug mit über seine ganze Länge durchgehend niedrigem Boden | [1990/17] | English: | Motor bogie for a railway vehicle with a low floor over its whole length | [1990/17] | French: | Bogie moteur pour véhicule ferroviaire à plancher bas sur toute sa longueur | [1990/17] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/50] | 07.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0183619 (SCHNEIDER JEUMONTRAIL SA [FR]); | [A]EP0247389 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0263793 (FIAT FERROVIARIA SAVIGLIANO [IT]) |