EP0375857 - Packaging method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI MACHINERY CO., LTD. 14-10, 2-chome, Kamejima Nakamura-ku Nagoya Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states FUJI MACHINERY CO., LTD. 14-10, 2-chome, Kamejima Nakamura-ku Nagoya Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seko, Kiyoshi NAGOYA FACTORY FUJI MACH. CO. LTD. 4-380, Nakaotai Nishi-ku Nagoya Aichi / JP | 02 /
Hatano, Masato NAGOYA FACTORY FUJI MACH. CO. LTD. 4-380, Nakaotai Nishi-ku Nagoya Aichi / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Shigeki NAGOYA FACTORY FUJI MACH. CO. LTD. 4-380, Nakaotai Nishi-ku Nagoya Aichi / JP | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H. Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. Harthauser Strasse 25d D-81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118890.6 | 11.10.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | JP19880335157 | 28.12.1988 Original published format: JP 33515788 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0375857 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0375857 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/06 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
B65B9/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/27] | Title | German: | Verpackungsverfahren und -vorrichtung | [1990/27] | English: | Packaging method and apparatus | [1990/27] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'emballage | [1990/27] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 06.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4525977 (MATT TIMOTHY S [US]) |