EP0372347 - Fast room temperature vulcanizing silicone elastomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lampe, Warren Roy 1328 West Beach Road Long Beach North Carolina 28465 / US | 02 /
Traver, Frank John 1 Downey Road Troy New York 12180 / US | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst, et al Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Schüler, Horst, Dr., et al Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 89121859.6 | 27.11.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | US19880282228 | 08.12.1988 Original published format: US 282228 | [1990/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0372347 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0372347 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04, C08K5/54 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08G77/16 (EP,US);
C08G77/24 (EP,US);
C08G77/26 (EP,US);
Y10S528/901 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00, C08L2666/28, C08L2666/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/24] | Title | German: | Bei Umgebungstemperatur schnell vulkanisierbare Silikonelastomere | [1990/24] | English: | Fast room temperature vulcanizing silicone elastomers | [1990/24] | French: | Elastomères de silicone qui vulcanisent rapidement à température ambiante | [1990/24] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 02.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/48] | 02.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1308985 (TRIPLEX SAFETY GLASS CO, et al); | [AP]EP0314584 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]); | [A]EP0281236 (DOW CORNING [GB]); | [A]US4752633 (AASEN STEVEN M [US], et al); | [AD]US4508888 (LETOFFE MICHEL [FR], et al) |