EP0374631 - Process for the oxygen concentration in air by means of vacuum-swing-adsorption using mixtures of CA-zeolit A molecular sieves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reiss, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Beethovenstrasse 11 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | [1990/26] | Application number, filing date | 89122665.6 | 08.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | DE19883842930 | 21.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3842930 | [1990/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0374631 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0374631 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374631 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C01B13/02, B01D53/04 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
B01D53/04 (EP,US);
B01D53/02 (EP,US);
C01B13/0259 (EP,US);
C01B13/027 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2253/302 (EP,US);
B01D2256/10 (EP,US);
B01D2257/104 (EP,US);
B01D2259/403 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur adsorptiven Sauerstoffanreicherung von Luft mit Mischungen aus Ca-Zeolith A Molekularsieben mittels Vakuum-Swing-Adsorption | [1990/26] | English: | Process for the oxygen concentration in air by means of vacuum-swing-adsorption using mixtures of CA-zeolit A molecular sieves | [1990/26] | French: | Procédé d'enrichissement d'oxygène de l'air par adsorption sous vide alternée en utilisant des mélanges de tamis moléculaires de zéolithes A contenant du calcium | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 13.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP62148304 ; | [A]EP0237074 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]EP0170026 (BAYER AG [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 379 (C-463)(2826) 10 Dezember 1987, & JP-A-62 148304 (NIPPON SANSO K.K.) 2 Juli 1987,, & JP62148304 A 00000000 |