EP0376329 - Liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Yuji c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/27] | Patentanwälte TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89124104.4 | 28.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | JP19880331344 | 28.12.1988 Original published format: JP 33134488 | JP19880331342 | 28.12.1988 Original published format: JP 33134288 | JP19880331341 | 28.12.1988 Original published format: JP 33134188 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0376329 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0376329 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0376329 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133, G02F1/136 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
G02F1/136213 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/27] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristall-Anzeigevorrichtung | [1990/27] | English: | Liquid crystal display device | [1990/27] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide | [1990/27] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 09.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0103523 (COISSARD PIERRE [FR], et al); | [A]DE3113041 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP0279171 (HOSIDEN ELECTRONICS CO [JP]); | [A]EP0276340 (HOSIDEN ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) | [ ] - CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE INTERNATIONAL DISPLAY RESEARCH CONFERENCE, San Diego, 15th - 17th October 1985, pages 30-31, Institute of Electrical and Electronics Engineers, Inc., New York, US; T. SAKAI et al.: "A color LC panel using a very thin film transistor (V-TFT); Page 30, left-hand column, paragraph 2. |