EP0364034 - Machine for making cigars [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1993 [1993/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tabacofina-Vander Elst Naamloze Vennootschap Prins Boudewijnlaan, 43 2520 Edegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states Tabacofina-Vander Elst Naamloze Vennootschap Prins Boudewijnlaan, 43 B-2520 Edegem / BE | ||
Former [1990/16] | For all designated states TABACOFINA Naamloze Vennootschap Prins Boudewijnlaan, 43 B-2520 Edegem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Graef, Walter Flamingostraat 31 B-2060 Antwerpen (Merksem) / BE | [1990/16] | Representative(s) | Ottelohe, Jozef René Bureau Ottelohe J.R. Postbus 3 Fruithoflaan 105 2600 Antwerpen (Berchem) / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | Ottelohe, Jozef René Bureau Ottelohe J.R. Postbus 3 Fruithoflaan 105 B-2600 Antwerpen (Berchem) / BE | ||
Former [1990/16] | Ottelohe, Jozef René Bureau Ottelohe J.R. b.v.b.a. Fruithoflaan, 105 Bus 3 B-2600 Antwerpen (Berchem) / BE | Application number, filing date | 89202519.8 | 06.10.1989 | [1990/16] | Priority number, date | BE19880001174 | 12.10.1988 Original published format: BE 8801174 | [1990/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0364034 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0364034 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A24C3/00, A24C1/38 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
A24C1/38 (EP);
A24C3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/16] | Title | German: | Maschine für die Herstellung von Zigarren | [1990/16] | English: | Machine for making cigars | [1990/16] | French: | Machine pour la fabrication de cigares | [1990/16] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 03.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1941643 ; | [A]US3237628 ; | [A]US3269393 |