EP0372604 - Connector for devices designed to be fitted onto conduits in a pressurized fluid system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METAL WORK S.p.A. Via Segni, 7 I-25062 Concesio (Brescia) / IT | [1990/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodella, Fausto Via VIII Marzo, 7 I-25060 Collebeato (Brescia) / IT | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Faraggiana, Vittorio Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Faraggiana, Vittorio, Dr. Ing. Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89202909.1 | 17.11.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | IT19880022244U | 02.12.1988 Original published format: IT 2224488 U | [1990/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0372604 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0372604 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0372604 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16L27/12, F16L37/12 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
F16L25/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/24] | F16L37/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/24] | Title | German: | Verbindungsstück für Vorrichtungen, die mit Rohrleitungen eines Druckmittelsystems verbunden werden | [1990/24] | English: | Connector for devices designed to be fitted onto conduits in a pressurized fluid system | [1990/24] | French: | Raccord pour dispositifs de connexion avec conduits d'un système de fluides sous pression | [1990/24] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 14.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2521127 (PRICE HARRY N); | [A]DE1476791 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]DE2909936 (LEHTINEN U J [FI]); | [A]FR2496220 (TIROLER ROEHREN & METALLWERK [AT]); | [A]FR2566506 (TROUVAY & CAUVIN ETS [FR]); | [A]US4640533 (KLEMM ROBERT E [US]) |