EP0325449 - Immunoassays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEXX LABORATORIES, INC. 100 Fore Street Portland, ME 04101 / US | [1995/02] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states IDEXX CORP. 100 Fore Street Portland Maine 04101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McMahon, Philip 45 Winn Road Falmouth, ME / US | 02 /
Tonelli, Quentin 37 Wellington Road Portland, ME / US | 03 /
Chaney, Larry 45 Austin Street Portland, ME / US | [1995/11] |
Former [1989/30] | 01 /
McMahon, Philip 45 Winn Road Falmouth Maine / US | ||
02 /
Tonelli, Quentin 37 Wellington Road Portland Maine / US | |||
03 /
Chaney, Larry 45 Austin Street Portland Maine / US | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89300490.3 | 19.01.1989 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | US19880145522 | 19.01.1988 Original published format: US 145522 | [1989/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0325449 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0325449 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325449 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/74, G01N33/58 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
G01N33/743 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
Y10S435/967 (EP,US);
Y10S435/97 (EP,US);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US);
Y10S436/805 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/30] | Title | German: | Immunoassays | [1989/30] | English: | Immunoassays | [1989/30] | French: | Immunoessais | [1989/30] | Examination procedure | 03.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 21.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.1995 | BE | 15.03.1995 | CH | 15.03.1995 | IT | 15.03.1995 | LI | 15.03.1995 | NL | 15.03.1995 | SE | 15.06.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 15.03.1995 | |
BE | 15.03.1995 | ||
CH | 15.03.1995 | ||
IT | 15.03.1995 | ||
LI | 15.03.1995 | ||
SE | 15.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 15.03.1995 | |
BE | 15.03.1995 | ||
CH | 15.03.1995 | ||
LI | 15.03.1995 | ||
SE | 15.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 15.03.1995 | |
CH | 15.03.1995 | ||
LI | 15.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | CH | 15.03.1995 | |
LI | 15.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0093613 (SYVA CO [US]); | [A]EP0203238 (QUIDEL [US]); | [X]EP0217403 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [XP]EP0253464 (HYBRITECH INC [US]) | Examination | - CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, vol. 121, 1982; pp. 225-230# | - INT. ARCHS. ALLERGY APPL. IMMUN, vol. 72, 1983; pp. 267-272# |