EP0335738 - Conveyors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1992 [1992/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLIKLOK CORPORATION 5224 Snapfinger Woods Drive Decatur Georgia 30035 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | For all designated states KLIKLOK CORPORATION 5224 Snapfinger Woods Drive Decatur Georgia 30035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harston, John Christopher 47 The Leys Clevedon Avon BS21 7YQ / GB | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Hulse, Thomas Arnold, et al Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | Hulse, Thomas Arnold, et al Hulse & Co. Eagle Star House, Carver Street Sheffield S1 4FP / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303211.0 | 31.03.1989 | [1989/40] | Priority number, date | GB19880007659 | 31.03.1988 Original published format: GB 8807659 | [1989/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0335738 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0335738 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65G19/02, B65B43/52 | [1989/40] | CPC: |
B65G17/26 (EP,US);
B65G2201/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/40] | Title | German: | Förderer | [1989/40] | English: | Conveyors | [1989/40] | French: | Convoyeurs | [1989/40] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 28.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1989286 [ ] (MILMOE MICHAEL J); | US2628542 [ ] (ROSS ALEXANDER H); | GB2145685 [ ] (SHIBUYA KOGYO CO LTD) |