EP0346146 - Table traversing apparatus for gear finishing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG. CO., LTD. 18-1, 2-chome Inadera Amagasaki / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG. CO., LTD. 18-1, 2-chome Inadera Amagasaki / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mihara, Toshihide 12-18, 3-chome Tomatsu-cho Amagasaki / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Ryoji 26-32, Higashi-2-chome Senriyama Suita / JP | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Valentine, Francis Anthony Brinsley, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Valentine, Francis Anthony Brinsley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305868.5 | 09.06.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | JP19880142402 | 09.06.1988 Original published format: JP 14240288 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0346146 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0346146 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23F23/12, B23F19/00, B23F19/06, B23Q1/14 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
B23F19/06 (EP,US);
B23F23/1293 (EP,US);
B23Q1/4809 (EP,US);
B23Q1/621 (EP,US);
Y10T409/10636 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30868 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18648 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/50] | B23F23/12, B23F19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/50] | Title | German: | Tischverschiebeapparat für Zahnradnachbearbeitungsmaschinen | [1989/50] | English: | Table traversing apparatus for gear finishing machines | [1989/50] | French: | Appareil pour le déplacement des tables des machines pour le finissage de roues dentées | [1989/50] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 03.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/52] | 03.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1087708 (JOHN ALFRED MILLS); | [A]GB943478 (JOHN ALFRED MILLS); | [A]DE3320129 ; | [A]US2581700 (PRAEG WALTER S); | [A]US1443899 (CHARLES KUSOLD); | [A]DE1127680 (ERICH TILLMANNS) |