|
01.12.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Description |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.10.2000 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2000 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
26 |
|
04.10.2000 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
29.09.2000 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.09.2000 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2000 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.09.2000 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.08.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.08.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2000 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.1999 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.06.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.12.1997 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
04.11.1997 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1997 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.08.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1997 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1997 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1997 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.08.1997 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.06.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.06.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.02.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.01.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.01.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
11.01.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.01.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.01.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.03.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.1994 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.08.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
10.08.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.08.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.1990 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1990 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1990 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.1989 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
12.10.1989 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
20.12.1987 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.1987 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.12.1987 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1987 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |