EP0353905 - Flash plug for I.V. catheters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.1994 [1994/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRITIKON, INC. 4110 George Road Tampa Florida 33634 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states CRITIKON, INC. 4110 George Road Tampa Florida 33634 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Joseph Jawshin 7013 West Linebaugh Avenue Tampa Florida 33625 / US | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307306.4 | 19.07.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | US19880221579 | 20.07.1988 Original published format: US 221579 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0353905 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353905 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M5/158 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
A61M39/20 (EP,US);
A61M25/0693 (EP,US);
A61M2039/205 (EP,US);
A61M2205/7536 (EP,US);
Y10S604/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL [1990/06] | Title | German: | Blutnachweisstopfen für einen I.V.-Katheter | [1990/06] | English: | Flash plug for I.V. catheters | [1990/06] | French: | Bouchon de détection du sang pour un cathéter I.V. | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 26.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4193399 (ROBINSON THOMAS P [US]); | [Y]EP0261835 (CRITIKON INC [US]) |