EP0356011 - Method and apparatus for container conveyance in germ-free filling/packaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO., LTD. 1-1, Naebo-cho 6-chome Higashi-ku Sapporo Hokkaido 065-0043 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS & CO., LTD. 1-1, Naebo-cho 6-chome Higashi-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 065 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ide, Takeo San Haitsu 303 No. 23-35 Tamachi Kawagoe-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Hatanaka, Koichi Shinsayama Haitsu 50501, No. 63 Aoyagi Sayama-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307574.7 | 25.07.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | JP19880186448 | 26.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18644888 | JP19880186449 | 26.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18644988 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356011 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356011 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0356011 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65B55/04, B65B55/10, B65B43/42 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
B65B55/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für den Behältertransport in einer Anlage zum keimfreien Füllen und Verpacken | [1990/09] | English: | Method and apparatus for container conveyance in germ-free filling/packaging system | [1990/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de transport de récipients dans un système pour le remplissage et l'empaquetage stériles | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 19.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2514027 [ ] (CLIFCORN LA VERNE E, et al); | US3018184 [ ] (MCK MARTIN WILLIAM); | DE1586311 [ ] (STRUNCK & CO MASCHF H); | FR2391112 [ ] (GATRUN ANSTALT [LI]); | EP0243003 [ ] (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD [JP]); | DE3633042 [ ] (DALLINGA HELMUT [DE]) |