EP0356046 - The reductive amination of hydroxy-containing compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.1993 [1993/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road London, SW1W 0SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road London, SW1W 0SU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobson, Ian David BP Chemicals Limited Salt End Hedon Hull HU12 8DS / GB | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Barlow, Michael Thomas, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents & Agreements Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | Barlow, Michael Thomas, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents & Agreements Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | ||
Former [1990/09] | Richardson, Derek BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents & Agreements Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307925.1 | 03.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | GB19880019663 | 18.08.1988 Original published format: GB 8819663 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356046 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356046 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/16, C07C213/02, C08G65/32 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
C07C209/16 (EP,US);
C07C213/02 (EP,US);
C08G65/322 (EP,US);
C08G65/3255 (EP,US);
C08G65/33306 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Reduktive Aminierung von Hydroxy-Gruppen enthaltenden Verbindungen | [1990/09] | English: | The reductive amination of hydroxy-containing compounds | [1990/09] | French: | L'amination réductive des composés qui contiennent des groupes hydroxyles | [1990/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 10.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/37] | 22.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3838076 (MOSS P, et al); | [X]GB2059792 (KAO CORP); | [X]WO8806579 (STEPAN CO [US], et al) |