|
05.11.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
24 |
|
17.10.2002 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Annex |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Withdrawal of application |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2002 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.07.2002 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2000 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.09.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.08.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.05.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2000 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2000 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2000 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2000 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.12.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
16.11.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.08.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1999 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.1999 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1998 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1998 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.09.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
26.09.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1997 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.12.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.12.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1995 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
16.01.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.1994 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.08.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.12.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.12.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.12.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.11.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.12.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
19.09.1989 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
19.09.1989 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1989 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.1989 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
19.09.1989 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |