EP0361835 - Turbine governor valve monitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.1992 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.06.1992 [1992/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fridsma, Daniel E. 1038 Chokecherry Drive Winter Springs, FL 32708 / US | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309736.0 | 25.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | US19880250198 | 28.09.1988 Original published format: US 250198 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361835 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/18, F01D17/08 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
F01D17/18 (EP,US);
F01K7/04 (KR);
F01D17/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, SE [1990/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung eines Turbinendüsenventils | [1990/14] | English: | Turbine governor valve monitor | [1990/14] | French: | Système de positionnement d'une soupape d'admission d'une turbine | [1990/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 05.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.04.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61116008 ; | [A]JP62255503 ; | [A]FR2048824 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]US3878401 (RONNEN URI G); | [A]US4056331 (SATO SEIKO); | [A]US4088875 (PODOLSKY LEAMAN B, et al); | [A]FR2417634 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [A]EP0004415 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]US4577281 (BUKOWSKI JAMES M [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 304 (M-526) 16 October 1986, & JP-A-61 116008 (TOSHIBA) 03 June 1986,, & JP61116008 A 19860603 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 134 (M-689) 23 April 1988, & JP-A-62 255503 (HITACHI) 07 November 1987,, & JP62255503 A 19871107 |