|
02.02.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1996 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1996 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.1996 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.1996 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.1996 |
Request for revocation of patent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.1996 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.1996 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.07.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
15.07.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
24.05.1996 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1996 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.1996 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1996 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1996 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.03.1996 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1996 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1996 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.02.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.1996 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1995 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.12.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1995 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1995 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.1995 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.10.1995 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
81 |
|
06.10.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.04.1995 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1995 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1994 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.09.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.09.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.09.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.09.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1993 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1993 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.1993 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.04.1993 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1992 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.1992 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.07.1990 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1990 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
13.03.1990 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.1990 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.1989 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.10.1989 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.1989 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.10.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
19.10.1989 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.03.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |