EP0365418 - Conveyor for carrying printed circuit boards along a path with varying inclinations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSL TECHNOLOGIES 12ème Rue 1ère Avenue Z.I. 06510 Carros / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states OSL TECHNOLOGIES 12ème Rue 1ère Avenue Z.I. F-06510 Carros / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Py, Jean Louis 46 Bis Bd Bishoffsheim F-06310 Nice / FR | [1990/17] | Representative(s) | Clanet dit Lamanit, Denis, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 55, rue d'Amsterdam 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | Clanet, Denis, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 55, rue d'Amsterdam F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89402859.6 | 17.10.1989 | [1990/17] | Priority number, date | FR19880013659 | 17.10.1988 Original published format: FR 8813659 | [1990/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0365418 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/00, B23K3/06, H05K3/26 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
B23K3/0676 (EP);
H05K13/0061 (EP);
H05K3/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/17] | Title | German: | Förderer zum Führen von gedruckten Leiterplatten längs einer Strecke mit wechselnder Neigung | [1990/17] | English: | Conveyor for carrying printed circuit boards along a path with varying inclinations | [1990/17] | French: | Convoyeur pour entraînement de cartes de circuits imprimés le long d'un trajet à pentes variables | [1990/17] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 26.10.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/37] | 15.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3318614 ; | [A]EP0204609 ; | [A]DE3328091 |