EP0427898 - Reading stand with page turning mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.04.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 21.06.1995 [1995/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chen, Chieh-Ju No 61. Hsin-Ping Road Tai-Ping Hsiang Taichung Hsien / TW | For all designated states Chen, Chien-Chan No 10-66, Sec. 1, Wan-Huo Road Nan-Tun Dist. Taichung City / TW | [1991/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/21] | Representative(s) | Bouju, André Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/21] | Bouju, André Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 F-75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 89403139.2 | 15.11.1989 | [1991/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0427898 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B42D9/06 | [1991/21] | CPC: |
B42D9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/21] | Title | German: | Leseständer mit Blattwendemechanismus | [1991/21] | English: | Reading stand with page turning mechanism | [1991/21] | French: | Support de lecture avec mécanisme pour tourner les pages | [1991/21] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/25] | 28.01.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH86859 (WALTER FREY [DE]); | [Y]US3550296 (CASTAGNA JOHN F); | [X]FR2226285 (LENEVEU PIERRE [FR]); | [X]US1531157 (THOMPSON JAMES J); | [X]FR439309 (GUIDO BAGGIO [IT], et al); | [A]DE360024 (OTTO OCHLICH) |