|
05.12.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2000 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2000 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.10.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.10.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.10.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
20 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
05.02.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.1998 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.1997 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.10.1997 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.04.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.04.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.04.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.04.1997 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
60 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
59 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.01.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.11.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.08.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.1996 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.07.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
28.09.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1995 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.1995 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1995 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.1995 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1995 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.07.1995 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.1995 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.1995 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.03.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
21.12.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.12.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.12.1994 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.10.1994 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1994 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.10.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1994 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
17.10.1994 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.1994 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
27.09.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.1994 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.1994 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.1994 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.1994 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.1994 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.1994 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
19.09.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
19.09.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.09.1994 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
14 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.07.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1994 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.1994 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
14 |
|
15.07.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1994 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.04.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.09.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1993 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.05.1993 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1993 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.1993 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1993 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
48 |
|
29.01.1993 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.1993 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.11.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.10.1992 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
07.10.1992 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
28.09.1992 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.1992 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1992 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.08.1992 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.07.1992 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1992 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1992 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.1992 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.1992 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.03.1992 |
Reply to communication to third party |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.03.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.03.1992 |
Reply to communication to third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.03.1992 |
Reply to communication to third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.1992 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Reply to communication to third party |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.12.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.12.1991 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.1991 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.1991 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.10.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.09.1991 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1991 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1991 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.1991 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1991 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1991 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1991 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.09.1991 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.09.1991 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1991 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1991 |
Reply to communication to third party |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.07.1991 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1991 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.1991 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.1991 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
04.07.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.07.1991 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.07.1991 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.1991 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.04.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
18.04.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.1991 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.1991 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.1991 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1990 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.1990 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.1990 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.12.1989 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.1989 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
11.12.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.11.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |