EP0334788 - A case for cosmetic and the like products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.1992 [1992/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXAPLAST, S.A. C. Gran 27 E-08292 Esparreguera (Barcelona) / ES | [1989/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodriguez Fernandez, Benet C. Carreras Candi 34 E-08028 Barcelona / ES | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Ponti Grau, Ignasi Paseo de Gracia, 33 E-08007 Barcelona / ES | [1989/39] | Application number, filing date | 89500033.9 | 16.03.1989 | [1989/39] | Priority number, date | ES19880000899 | 23.03.1988 Original published format: ES 8800899 | [1989/39] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0334788 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0334788 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/22, A45C11/24, A45D40/18 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
A45D40/22 (EP,US);
A45C11/24 (EP,US);
A45D33/006 (EP,US);
A45D40/18 (EP,US);
A45C2011/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1989/39] | Title | German: | Behälter für kosmetische und ähnliche Erzeugnisse | [1989/39] | English: | A case for cosmetic and the like products | [1989/39] | French: | Boîtier pour cosmétiques et produits analogues | [1989/39] | File destroyed: | 22.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 07.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/23] | 07.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.11.1991 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR731814 (DANIEL LAFON ET CIE); | [Y]US1908132 (DUELL CHARLES H, et al); | [Y]GB429637 (JOSEPH WILLIAM BRISLEY); | [A]FR2139810 (STARKERMANN PAUL ET CO) |