EP0349468 - Hygienic protector for toilet bowls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.1990 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1990 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.07.1990 [1990/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garcia Borras, Eduardo Paseo Fabra y Puig, 125 E-08016 Barcelona / ES | [1990/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Ferregüela Colon, Eduardo Oficina Sugranes Calle Provenza, 304 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Ferregüela Colon, Eduardo Oficina Sugranes Calle Provenza, 304 E-08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 89500071.9 | 27.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | ES19880002124 | 01.07.1988 Original published format: ES 8802124 | [1990/01] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0349468 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A47K13/14 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
A47K13/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/01] | Title | German: | Hygienische Schutzabdeckung für Toilettenschüssel | [1990/01] | English: | Hygienic protector for toilet bowls | [1990/01] | French: | Protection hygiénique pour water-closet | [1990/01] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.05.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]FR2618062 ; | [X]WO8604222 ; | [X]GB1339675 ; | [X]FR2043852 ; | [A]DE3212243 |