|
24.04.1998 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.1998 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.1998 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.1998 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.12.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.12.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
16.12.1997 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.1997 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
13.11.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.1997 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
20 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.07.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.06.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.04.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.02.1997 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
02.12.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
16.10.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.1996 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1996 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1996 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.08.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.05.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1996 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.04.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1996 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.03.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.03.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.02.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.11.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.10.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.10.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.08.1995 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.05.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.05.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.03.1995 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.01.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.01.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.01.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.10.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.09.1994 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1994 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.07.1994 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.05.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.1994 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.03.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1993 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1992 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.1992 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1992 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.04.1992 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.1991 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1991 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1991 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1990 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.1990 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.12.1990 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1990 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.12.1990 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.10.1990 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.10.1990 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.10.1990 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.1990 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.01.1990 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.1989 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.1989 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.12.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.07.1989 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |