|
19.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
06.03.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.06.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.1996 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.05.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.1996 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.1996 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.1996 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
31.01.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.01.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.1995 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.06.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.1995 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1995 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.05.1995 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1995 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.01.1995 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.1994 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.12.1994 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.10.1994 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
06.10.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
29.07.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1994 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.1994 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.01.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.01.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.01.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.01.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.1993 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1992 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.1992 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1992 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
13.07.1992 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.1992 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.1990 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.1990 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.03.1990 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
07.03.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |