|
21.04.1999 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
18.12.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.1997 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
274 |
|
20.08.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.1997 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1997 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
15.01.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
15.01.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.02.1996 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.1996 |
Claims |
Appeal |
13 |
|
30.01.1996 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
30.01.1996 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.01.1996 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.01.1996 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.10.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.1995 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.1995 |
Oral proceedings: Annex to summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.10.1995 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.1995 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.1995 |
Note of consultation between member and appellant / representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.1995 |
F3047 Inadmissibility of the appeal: diverse |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.1995 |
Note of consultation between member and appellant / representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.1995 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Claims |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
12.02.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.12.1994 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1994 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1994 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.04.1994 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
22.04.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.04.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1994 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.05.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
01.03.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
01.03.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
01.03.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
01.03.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.01.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.1990 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1990 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.1990 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.1990 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.1990 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.1990 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
21.02.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
208 |
|
21.02.1990 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1990 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |